EP1696168 - Prefabricated insulated element for the reception of a chimney pipe or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER G+H AG Bürgermeister-Grünzweig-Strasse 1 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2006/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bissinger, Claus, Dr. In der Lehmenkaut 6 67271 Kleinkarlbach / DE | 02 /
Albrecht, Volker Neustadter Strasse 150 67360 Lingenfeld / DE | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Bockhorni & Brüntjen Partnerschaft Patentanwälte mbB Agnes-Bernauer-Straße 88 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Bockhorni & Kollegen Elsenheimerstraße 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | Bockhorni, Josef Patent-& Rechtsanwälte, Grosse, Bockhorni, Schumacher, Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06003520.1 | 21.02.2006 | [2006/35] | Priority number, date | DE20051008761 | 25.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005008761 | [2006/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1696168 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1696168 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/02 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
F16L59/024 (EP);
E04F17/04 (EP);
E04G15/061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Title | German: | Als Fertigbauteil ausgebildetes Dämmstoffelement für die Aufnahme eines Schornsteinrohres oder dergleichen | [2006/35] | English: | Prefabricated insulated element for the reception of a chimney pipe or the like | [2006/35] | French: | Elément isolant préfabriqué pour la réception d'un tuyau de cheminée ou similaire | [2006/35] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 28.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.05.2008 | CZ | 07.05.2008 | DK | 07.05.2008 | EE | 07.05.2008 | FI | 07.05.2008 | IE | 07.05.2008 | IT | 07.05.2008 | LT | 07.05.2008 | LV | 07.05.2008 | NL | 07.05.2008 | PL | 07.05.2008 | RO | 07.05.2008 | SI | 07.05.2008 | SK | 07.05.2008 | TR | 07.05.2008 | BG | 07.08.2008 | SE | 07.08.2008 | GR | 08.08.2008 | ES | 18.08.2008 | IS | 07.09.2008 | PT | 07.10.2008 | HU | 08.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
HU | 08.11.2008 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 07.05.2008 | |
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | FI | 07.05.2008 | |
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 07.05.2008 | |
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 07.05.2008 | |
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 07.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2588595 (GRUENZWEIG HARTMANN GLASFASER [DE]) [A] 1-21* page 3, line 5 - page 7, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4106835 (VAHLBRAUK KARL HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1-21 * column 3, line 39 - column 6, line 54; figure - * |