EP1696235 - Biosensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishimi, Taisei c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | 02 /
Ezoe, Toshihide c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | 03 /
Kubo, Toshiaki c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | 04 /
Tomita, Hidetoshi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06003590.4 | 22.02.2006 | [2006/35] | Priority number, date | JP20050046977 | 23.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005046977 | JP20050163454 | 03.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005163454 | JP20050163455 | 03.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005163455 | JP20050163456 | 03.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005163456 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1696235 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1696235 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
G01N33/54353 (EP,US);
G01N33/54373 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [2007/19] |
Former [2006/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Biosensor | [2006/35] | English: | Biosensor | [2006/35] | French: | Biocapteur | [2006/35] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 01.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 22.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.10.2008 | 29.09.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.04.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5242828 (BERGSTROEM JAN [SE], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 5 - column 8, line 36 *; | [X]US5543054 (CHARKOUDIAN JOHN [US], et al) [X] 9-15,24-28 * the whole document *; | [X]US6322979 (BAMDAD CYNTHIA C [US], et al) [X] 9-15,24-28 * column 4, line 66 - column 8, line 25 * * column 18, line 25 - column 21, line 23 *; | [X]WO02057422 (SCHWARTZ DAVID A [US]) [X] 9-15,24-28 * page 18 - page 21 *; | [X]EP1293779 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * page 4, line 49 - page 7, line 38 *; | [X]WO03075012 (STEINBERG HOLDING B V [NL], et al) [X] 16-23* page 3, line 15 - page 8, line 26 *; | [X]WO2004046724 (BIACORE AB [SE], et al) [X] 9-15,24-28 * page 4, line 30 - page 7, line 5 *; | [X] - JOHNSSON B ET AL, "IMMOBILIZATION OF PROTEINS TO A CARBOXYMETHYLDEXTRAN-MODIFIED GOLD SURFACE FOR BIOSPECIFIC INTERACTION ANALYSIS IN SURFACE PLASMON RESONANCE SENSORS", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (19911101), vol. 198, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 268 - 277, XP000232754 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(91)90424-R | [X] - LOFAS S ET AL, "METHODS FOR SITE CONTROLLED COUPLING TO CARBOXYMETHYLDEXTRAN SURFACES IN SURFACE PLASMON RESONANCE SENSORS", BIOSENSORS & BIOELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (1995), vol. 10, no. 9, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 813 - 822, XP000783535 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0956-5663(95)99220-F | [X] - LOEFAAS S ET AL, "A NOVEL HYDROGEL MATRIX ON GOLD SURFACES IN SURFACE PLASMON RESONANCE SENSORS FOR FAST AND EFFICIENT COVALENT IMMOBILIZATION OF LIGANDS", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (1990), no. 21, ISSN 0022-4936, pages 1526 - 1528, XP008050238 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c39900001526 | Examination | WO0065352 | US2002128234 | US2003032046 | - "Affi-Gel 10 and 15 activated affinity media", BIORAD TECH NOTE, no. 1085 | - SAHNI ET AL, "Binding of Basic Fibroblast Growth Factor to Fibrinogen and Fibrin", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 273, no. 13, pages 7554 - 7559 |