EP1698927 - Point scanning laser scanning microscope and method for adjusting a microscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl-Zeiss Jena GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolleschensky, Ralf An der Promenade 3 99510 Apolda / DE | 02 /
Kempe, Michael Am Mönchenberge 8 07751 Jena / DE | 03 /
Gross, Herbert Ginsterweg 3/1 73457 Essingen / DE | [2006/36] | Application number, filing date | 06003658.9 | 23.02.2006 | [2006/36] | Priority number, date | DE20051009188 | 01.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005009188 | [2006/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1698927 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
G02B21/0032 (EP,US);
G02B21/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Title | German: | Punktscannendes Laser-Scanning-Mikroskop sowie Verfahren zur Einstellung eines Mikroskops | [2006/36] | English: | Point scanning laser scanning microscope and method for adjusting a microscope | [2006/36] | French: | Microscope à laser scannant des points tout comme procédé destiné à l'installation d'un microscope | [2006/36] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 27.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/32] | 24.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3409657 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * page 7; figures 1,2 *; | [XAY]EP0468817 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB]) [X] 1,3,8,12,21 * the whole document * [A] 2,15 [Y] 4,5,7; | [Y]US2003048530 (SANDER ULRICH [CH]) [Y] 7* paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036]; figure 2a *; | [X]US2003142292 (WOLLESCHENSKY RALF [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,22 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0028]; figures 2,3b * |