EP1670262 - Lighting optical system for a projection display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [2007/50] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashizume, Toshiaki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Itoh, Yoshitaka c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06003749.6 | 27.10.1997 | [2006/24] | Priority number, date | JP19960305734 | 30.10.1996 Original published format: JP 30573496 | JP19970093003 | 26.03.1997 Original published format: JP 9300397 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1670262 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1670262 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31, G03B21/20, G03B33/12 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
G03B33/12 (EP,US);
G03B21/00 (KR);
G02B27/1046 (EP,US);
G02B27/141 (EP,US);
G02B27/143 (EP,US);
G02B27/145 (EP,US);
G02B27/149 (EP,US);
G02B27/283 (EP,US);
G02B3/0062 (EP,US);
G02F1/13362 (EP,US);
G03B21/14 (KR);
G03B21/2073 (EP,US);
G09F9/00 (KR);
H04N9/31 (KR);
H04N9/3105 (EP,US);
H04N9/315 (EP,US);
G02B3/0043 (EP,US);
G02B3/0056 (EP,US);
G02F1/133605 (EP,US);
G02F1/133607 (EP,US);
H04N5/74 (EP,US);
H04N5/7441 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2006/24] | Title | German: | Optisches Beleuchtungssystem für eine Projektionsvorrichtung | [2007/22] | English: | Lighting optical system for a projection display apparatus | [2006/24] | French: | Système optique d`éclairage pour un appareil d`affichage par projection | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/24] | Optisches Beleuchtungssystem für eine Projektionsanzeigevorrichtung | Examination procedure | 24.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 10.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97909650.0 / EP0889351 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0646828 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [YD] 1-10 * figures 1,3,5,11 *; | [Y]US2326970 (KURT RANTSCH) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5510861 (MINICH ARTHUR P [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-10 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0492661 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH04125536 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920818), vol. 016, no. 386, Database accession no. (P - 1404), & JP04125536 A 19920427 (NEC CORP) [Y] 4-10 * abstract * |