EP1698796 - Method of fabrication of a wear sensor for a vehicle brake lining [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/36] | Wear sensor for a vehicle brake lining | ||
[2008/14] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hirschmann Automotive GmbH Oberer Paspelsweg 6-8 6830 Rankweil-Brederis / AT | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wille, Manuel Hirschbündt 3 6830 Rankweil / AT | 02 /
Jäger, Günter Major-Ellensohnstrasse 59A 6840 Götzis / AT | 03 /
Gächter, Oliver Strassenhäuser 12D 6820 Koblach / AT | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Greif, Thomas Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Greif, Thomas Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | Thul, Hermann Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Allee 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06003765.2 | 24.02.2006 | [2006/36] | Priority number, date | DE20051009123 | 01.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005009123 | [2006/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1698796 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1698796 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16D66/02, B60T17/22 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
F16D66/026 (EP,US);
B60T17/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Sensors zur Erfassung der Abnutzung eines Bremsbelages eines Fahrzeuges | [2008/14] | English: | Method of fabrication of a wear sensor for a vehicle brake lining | [2008/14] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un capteur d'usure de garniture de frein de véhicule | [2008/14] |
Former [2006/36] | Sensor zur Erfassung der Abnutzung eines Bremsbelages eines Fahrzeuges | ||
Former [2006/36] | Wear sensor for a vehicle brake lining | ||
Former [2006/36] | Capteur d'usure de garniture de frein de véhicule | Examination procedure | 23.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.2009
ADMISSIBLE BOWA-electronic GmbH & Co. KG Nehrener Strasse 4-6 72810 Gomaringen / DE Opponent's representative Schneider, Peter Christian Fiedler, Ostermann & Schneider Patentanwälte Obere Karspüle 41 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.2009
ADMISSIBLE BOWA-electronic GmbH & Co. KG Nehrener Strasse 4-6 72810 Gomaringen / DE Opponent's representative Schneider, Peter Christian Fiedler, Ostermann & Schneider Patentanwälte Obere Karspüle 41 37073 Göttingen / DE | 03.07.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.02.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.02.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.02.2012 | 24.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 28.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.02.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.08.2008 | CZ | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | EE | 27.08.2008 | FI | 27.08.2008 | IE | 27.08.2008 | IT | 27.08.2008 | LT | 27.08.2008 | LV | 27.08.2008 | NL | 27.08.2008 | PL | 27.08.2008 | RO | 27.08.2008 | SI | 27.08.2008 | SK | 27.08.2008 | TR | 27.08.2008 | BG | 27.11.2008 | SE | 27.11.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | ES | 08.12.2008 | IS | 27.12.2008 | PT | 27.01.2009 | AT | 24.02.2009 | LU | 24.02.2009 | BE | 28.02.2009 | HU | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
AT | 24.02.2009 | ||
LU | 24.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
AT | 24.02.2009 | ||
LU | 24.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
AT | 24.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
AT | 24.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 27.08.2008 | |
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 27.08.2008 | |
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 27.08.2008 | |
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03199902 ; | [X]EP0742380 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [X]EP0916868 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [DX]DE19822168 (BOWA ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1,4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]US6338397 (GEZGIN TANIL [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,5* abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911126), vol. 015, no. 466, Database accession no. (P - 1280), & JP03199902 A 19910830 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYST LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19822168 |