EP1712746 - Electric actuator for variable drive of a gas exchange valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elendt, Harald Im Elmen 7 96146 Altendorf / DE | 02 /
Geiger, Uwe, Dr. Haberfeld 9 14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | [2006/42] | Application number, filing date | 06003865.0 | 25.02.2006 | [2006/42] | Priority number, date | DE20051017410 | 15.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005017410 | [2006/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1712746 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1712746 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01L9/04, H01L41/083 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
H02N2/021 (EP);
F01L9/20 (EP);
F01L9/24 (EP);
H10N30/505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/26] |
Former [2006/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Stellvorrichtung zur variablen Betätigung eines Gaswechselventils | [2006/42] | English: | Electric actuator for variable drive of a gas exchange valve | [2006/42] | French: | Dispositif d'actionnnement electrique pour actionnement variable d'une soupape | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 22.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0143128 (MOLONEY PAUL JULIAN); | [A]US4721447 (ERCKMANN BERNHARD [DE]); | [AD]US4762095 (MEZGER HANS [DE], et al); | [A]EP0404965 (ISUZU CERAMICS RES INST [JP]); | [AD]EP0962628 (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE CORP LP [US]); | [A]US2004104368 (WEBER JAMES R [US]) | by applicant | DE3616540 | EP0962628 |