EP1705558 - Method and apparatus for capturing full-screen frames [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASUSTeK Computer Inc. No. 150, Li-Te Rd. Peitou Taipei / TW | [2006/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiu, Kao-Yi No. 150, Li-Te Rd. Peitou Taipei / TW | 02 /
Lai, Yu-Hsuan No. 150, Li-Te Rd. Peitou Taipei / TW | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06003994.8 | 27.02.2006 | [2006/39] | Priority number, date | CN2005152972 | 01.03.2005 Original published format: CN200510052972 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1705558 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1705558 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, H04N7/24 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
G09G5/003 (EP);
G06F3/1454 (EP);
G09G5/393 (EP);
G09G2340/0407 (EP);
G09G5/001 (EP);
G09G5/39 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/16] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Erfassung von Vollbildraster | [2006/40] | English: | Method and apparatus for capturing full-screen frames | [2006/39] | French: | Méthode et dispositif permettant de capturer des trames à plein écran | [2006/40] |
Former [2006/39] | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Erfassung vom Vollbildraster | ||
Former [2006/39] | Méthod et dispositif permettant de capturer des trames à plein écran | Examination procedure | 06.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 09.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 29.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004189677 (AMANN GARRY W [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0050] * * figure 4 * * figure 1 * * figure 5 *; | [X]US5878248 (TEHRANIAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3 * * column 8 * * column 9 * * column 12 * * figure 2 * |