EP1698256 - Seat, in particular an office chair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bock 1 GmbH & Co. KG An der Heide 17 92353 Postbauer-Heng / DE | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bock, Hermann Jagdstrasse 8 90602 Pyrbaum / DE | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Andreas Oberer Markt 26 92318 Neumarkt i.d.OPf. / DE | [2006/36] | Application number, filing date | 06004195.1 | 02.03.2006 | [2006/36] | Priority number, date | DE20051010533 | 04.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005010533 | [2006/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1698256 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1698256 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/40, A47C7/44 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
A47C7/402 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [2007/19] |
Former [2006/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sitzmöbel, insbesondere Bürostuhl | [2006/36] | English: | Seat, in particular an office chair | [2006/36] | French: | Siège, notamment chaise de bureau | [2006/36] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.04.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 24.09.2008 | BE | 31.03.2009 | [2010/13] |
Former [2010/01] | DK | 24.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [AY]US6158810 (GALLOWAY ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * [Y] 1; | [AY]EP0278651 (MT DESIGNS [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * [Y] 1; | [AY]US2003062756 (BALLENDAT MARTIN [AT]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * [Y] 1; | [AY]EP0970639 (PROVENDA MARKETING AG [CH]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * [Y] 1; | [A]US2599301 (BUREN TRACY HENRY VAN) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |