EP1708220 - Multi-operational input device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2006/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeda, Takuya c/o ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-cho Ota-ku, Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | 02 /
Tokiwa, Kenichi c/o ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-cho Ota-ku, Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | 03 /
Nonaka, Kaiji c/o ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-cho Ota-ku, Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06004629.9 | 07.03.2006 | [2006/40] | Priority number, date | JP20050103039 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005103039 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1708220 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1708220 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01H27/06, G05G9/047 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
G05G9/047 (EP);
H01H25/06 (EP);
G05G2009/04774 (EP);
G05G2009/04777 (EP);
G05G2009/04781 (EP);
H01H2025/045 (EP);
H01H25/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/24] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Multifunktionale Eingabevorrichtung | [2006/40] | English: | Multi-operational input device | [2006/40] | French: | Dispositif d'entrée multidirectionnel | [2006/40] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 17.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]EP1394830 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [YD] 1,2,4 * abstract * [A] 3,5; | [Y]US6713896 (BURTSCHER HANS [AU], et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0041]; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2785084 (SC2N SA [FR]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US2002003081 (KAWASE TATSUAKI [JP]) [A] 5 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2004087307 |