EP1700742 - Vibration resistant vehicle mirror connecting assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEKRA Lang GmbH & Co. KG Schuckertstrasse 8-20 90765 Fürth / DE | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Branham, Michael Dean 10 Pineview Church Court Blythewood, SC 29016 / US | 02 /
Courbon, Emmanuel 8 Cold Branch Court Columbia, SC 29223 / US | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 06004636.4 | 07.03.2006 | [2006/37] | Priority number, date | US20050073947 | 07.03.2005 Original published format: US 73947 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1700742 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1700742 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/06, F16B7/04, F16B7/14, F16B2/14 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
B60R1/0605 (EP,US);
B60R1/06 (KR);
F16B2/04 (EP,US);
F16B2/14 (EP,US);
F16B7/0413 (EP,US);
Y10T403/557 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Title | German: | Vibrationsfeste Verbindungseinrichtung für Fahrzeugrückspiegel | [2006/37] | English: | Vibration resistant vehicle mirror connecting assembly | [2006/37] | French: | Dispositif de connexion pour un retroviseur de véhicule résistant aux vibrations | [2006/37] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 01.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.01.2008 | BE | 23.01.2008 | CH | 23.01.2008 | CY | 23.01.2008 | CZ | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | EE | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | IT | 23.01.2008 | LI | 23.01.2008 | LT | 23.01.2008 | LV | 23.01.2008 | NL | 23.01.2008 | PL | 23.01.2008 | RO | 23.01.2008 | SI | 23.01.2008 | SK | 23.01.2008 | TR | 23.01.2008 | IE | 07.03.2008 | LU | 07.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | BG | 23.04.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | GR | 24.04.2008 | ES | 04.05.2008 | IS | 23.05.2008 | PT | 23.06.2008 | HU | 24.07.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
TR | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 07.03.2008 | ||
LU | 07.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
HU | 24.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 07.03.2008 | ||
LU | 07.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 07.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 07.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 07.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CH | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 23.01.2008 | |
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US734509 (CAESAR JACOB [US]) [A] 1-24 * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 7; figure - *; | [X]DE2950742 (ROSE & KRIEGER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-10,12,13,16,17,19-22,24 * page 4, line 20 - line 24 * * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 13; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4344719 (THOM WENZEL W) [X] 1,2,9,13,20 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 13; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]EP1086855 (BRITAX RAINSFORDS PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1,13,20* paragraphs [0005] , [0019] - [0025]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2005008431 (ALBAUGH HAROLD [US]) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0013] - [0018]; figures 1,5 * | by applicant | US4565345 | US5419522 |