EP1740018 - Microwave oven using bar code and method for controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Kwang Keun 1002-2106, Yeongtong-Dranche, Mangpo-dong Yeontong-gu, Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/19] |
Former [2007/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06004661.2 | 07.03.2006 | [2007/01] | Priority number, date | KR20050055692 | 27.06.2005 Original published format: KR 2005055692 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1740018 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1740018 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/68 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
H05B6/6441 (EP,US);
H05B6/64 (KR);
A23L5/10 (KR);
G06K19/06028 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/19] |
Former [2007/36] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikrowellenofen mit Streifencode und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2007/01] | English: | Microwave oven using bar code and method for controlling the same | [2007/01] | French: | Four à micro-ondes utilisant un code à barres et procédé pour le commander | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 26.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2300053 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US4323773 (CARPENTER LOWELL L) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP1501336 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]GB2359148 (ETHERIDGE RICHARD [GB]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US6124583 (BOWERS FORD W [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US5426280 (SMITH HARRY F [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US6249710 (DRUCKER STEVEN J [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0550124 (MENUMASTER INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * |