EP1708452 - Multimodal service session establishing and providing method, multimodal service session establishing and providing system, and corresponding control program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ono, Yoshihiro c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Kazuhiro c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kashiwagi, Takehiko c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Shiraki, Takashi c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Funaya, Kouichi c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06005639.7 | 20.03.2006 | [2006/40] | Priority number, date | JP20050104435 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005104435 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1708452 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1708452 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
H04L65/1043 (EP,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L65/403 (EP,US);
H04L65/4038 (EP,US);
H04L65/4061 (EP,US);
H04L65/1016 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/24] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Einrichtung und Bereitstellung multimodaler Dienstsitzungen, System zur Einrichtung und Bereitstellung multimodaler Dienstsitzungen sowie Steuerprogramm dafür | [2006/40] | English: | Multimodal service session establishing and providing method, multimodal service session establishing and providing system, and corresponding control program | [2006/40] | French: | Procédé d'établissement et de mise à disposition d'une session de service multimodale, système d'établissement et de mise à disposition d'une session de service multimodale et programme de commande correspondant | [2006/40] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004190489 (PALAEZ MARIANA BENITEZ [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * paragraphs [0061] - [0074]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2005021616 (RAJAHALME JARNO [FR], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraphs [0060] - [0063] - [0073] , [0079] - [0081] - [0108] - [0110]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2004078468 (HEDIN JAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraphs [0060] - [0632]; figures 2-6,8 * |