EP1705672 - Inductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumida Corporation 3-3-6 Nihonbashi-Ningyo-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0013 / JP | [2006/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawarai, Mitsugu 8-10-1, 2-chome Sakura Iwanuma-shi Miyagi prefecture / JP | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Matthias W. Patentanwalt Schwanseestrasse 43 81549 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Schäfer, Matthias W. Patentanwalt Schwanseestrasse 43 81549 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06005730.4 | 21.03.2006 | [2006/39] | Priority number, date | JP20050083529 | 23.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005083529 | JP20050196252 | 05.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005196252 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1705672 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1705672 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01F17/00, H01F10/10 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
H01F17/0006 (EP,KR,US);
H01F17/0013 (EP,KR,US);
H01F27/32 (KR);
H01F41/046 (EP,KR,US);
H01F2017/006 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/39] | H01F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/39] | Title | German: | Induktivität | [2006/39] | English: | Inductor | [2006/39] | French: | Inductance | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 14.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2083952 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [X] 1-15 * page 1, lines 3-6 * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 46 * * page 3, line 126 - page 5, line 60 * * page 5, line 117 - page 6, line 64 * * figures 1-10 *; | [X]DE19639881 (SIEMENS MATSUSHITA COMPONENTS [DE]) [X] 1-15 * column 1, lines 11-23,47-64; figure 1 *; | [X]US2002167783 (WAFFENSCHMIDT EBERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0009] , [0013] , [0023]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2003107465 (HIRAOKA TOSHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0023] , [0031] , [0046] - [0048] - [0052] , [0060] - [0065] - [0068] - [0070] - [0073] - [0075] * * paragraphs [0081] - [0083]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0108] - [0111]; figure 5 * * paragraphs [0128] , [0428] *; | [X]WO03096361 (SPLASHPOWER LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 28 * * page 8, lines 12-16; figure 9 * * page 12, lines 28-32 *; | [A]US2004185309 (HASHIMOTO YASUO [JP], et al) [A] 12* paragraphs [0018] , [0029] , [0092] , [0098] , [0101] * |