EP1683688 - Guide member for curtain airbag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKATA CORPORATION 4-30, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8510 / JP | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Tadashi c/o Takata Corp. 4-30 Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8510 / JP | 02 /
Kumagai, Masayoshi c/o Takata Corp. 4-30 Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8510 / JP | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06005878.1 | 10.07.2003 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | JP20020212693 | 22.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002212693 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1683688 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1683688 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
B60R21/232 (EP,US);
B60R2021/161 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23386 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2010/12] |
Former [2006/30] | DE, FR, GB, SE | Title | German: | Führungselement für Seitenairbag | [2006/30] | English: | Guide member for curtain airbag | [2006/30] | French: | Guidage pour coussin gonflable en forme de rideau | [2006/30] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 16.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FR, SE | 01.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/45] | 04.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03015531.1 / EP1384632 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030015531) is 13.10.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0955213 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 1 - line 42; figure 1 * [Y] 2,3; | [XY]US6237938 (BOXEY KEVIN J [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 41 - line 50; figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]US5951046 (HOSODA HIROTSUGU [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3 * column 3, line 9 - line 61; figures 1,3-15 *; | [A]WO0132474 (BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECH [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 14, paragraph 3; figure 7 * |