EP1717530 - Heat exchanger, more particularly rear evaporator for automotive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dürr, Gottfried Dipl.-Ing. Elfriede-Breitenbach-Strasse 38 b 71640 Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
Kranich, Michael Dipl.-Ing. Friedrich-Breining-Str. 10 74354 Besigheim / DE | 03 /
Staffa, Karl-Heinz Dipl.-Ing. Balinger Strasse 79 70567 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
Walter, Christoph Dipl.-Ing. Werner-Haas-Weg 32 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/23] |
Former [2006/44] | 01 /
Dürr, Gottfried Dipl.-Ing. Nachsommerweg 29 70437 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
Kranich, Michael Dipl.-Ing. Friedrich-Breining-Str. 10 74354 Besigheim / DE | |||
03 /
Staffa, Karl-Heinz Dipl.-Ing. Balinger Strasse 79 70567 Stuttgart / DE | |||
04 /
Walter, Christoph Dipl.-Ing. Werner-Haas-Weg 32 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Wartbergstrasse 14 70191 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/26] |
Former [2012/15] | Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Presselstraße 10 70191 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06005937.5 | 23.03.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | DE20051020499 | 29.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005020499 | DE20061004673 | 31.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006004673 | [2006/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1717530 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1717530 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717530 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F25B39/02, F28F27/02, F28F9/02, F28D1/047 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
F25B39/028 (EP);
F28D1/0476 (EP);
F28F9/0221 (EP);
F28F9/0278 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/26] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wärmeübertrager, insbesondere Heckverdampfer für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2006/44] | English: | Heat exchanger, more particularly rear evaporator for automotive vehicle | [2006/44] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur, en particulier évaporateur arrière pour véhicule automobile | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 24.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 19.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2006 | CY | 28.06.2017 | CZ | 28.06.2017 | DK | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | ES | 28.06.2017 | FI | 28.06.2017 | IT | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | NL | 28.06.2017 | PL | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | RO | 28.06.2017 | SE | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | TR | 28.06.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | AT | 23.03.2018 | GB | 23.03.2018 | IE | 23.03.2018 | LU | 23.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 23.03.2006 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
AT | 23.03.2018 | ||
GB | 23.03.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2018 | ||
LU | 23.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
AT | 23.03.2018 | ||
GB | 23.03.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2018 | ||
LU | 23.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
AT | 23.03.2018 | ||
GB | 23.03.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2018 | ||
LU | 23.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
GB | 23.03.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2018 | ||
LU | 23.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 23.03.2018 | ||
LU | 23.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 23.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0634615 (MODINE MFG CO [US]) [X] 1,2,12,13,16 * figure 1 * * column 5, line 51 - line 53 *; | [X]DE10049256 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,11,14,16* figure - *; | [X]EP1270294 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP [JP]) [X] 17 * figure 1 * * column 6, line 42 - line 44 *; | [XD]DE10260107 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [XD] 1,3,4,6,8,11,12,14 * figures 1, 6 * * column 9, line 47 - line 58 * * column 16, line 46 - line 47 * * column 16, line 64 - column 17, line 5 * * column 19, line 16 - line 19 * * column 19, line 23 - line 26 * * column 10, line 11 - line 13 * | by applicant | DE10260107 |