EP1708152 - Incident command post [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2006/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaldewey, Tim 140 Vernon Street Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | 02 /
Pei, Sheng 101 Lombard St, 14E San Francisco, CA 94111 / US | 03 /
Raiyani, Samir 965 E El Camino Real Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2007/02] |
Former [2006/40] | 01 /
Kaldewey, Tim 140 Vernon Street Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | ||
02 /
Pei, Sheng 1310 S. 58th Street Richmond, CA 94804 / US | |||
03 /
Raiyani, Samir 965 E El Camino Real Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06006156.1 | 24.03.2006 | [2006/40] | Priority number, date | US20050092310 | 28.03.2005 Original published format: US 92310 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1708152 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1708152 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09B29/10 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
G09B29/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Title | German: | Ereigniskommandostelle | [2006/40] | English: | Incident command post | [2006/40] | French: | Poste de commande incident | [2006/40] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 23.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/29] | 24.01.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/29] | 28.02.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SHARAD AGARWAL, DAVID MARTIN AND DAVID OPPENHEIMER, "Design and Implementation of the Mote Mapping Service", VISION.BC.EDU, (20000516), URL: http://vision.bc.edu/~dmartin/papers/motes, (20070830), XP002448755 [X] 1-9 * 1. introduction paragraphs 1,3 and 4 3. Mote mapping service goals and definitions paragraph 1 8. Future work and conclusion paragraph 5 * | [X] - RADU STOLERU, TIAN HE, JOHN STANKOVIC, "Walking GPS: A practical solution for localisation in manually deployed wireless sensor networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 29TH ANNUAL IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON LOCAL COMPUTER NETWORKS (LCN'04), (20041118), pages 480 - 489, XP002448768 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | - SHARAD AGARWAL; DAVID MARTIN; DAVID OPPENHEIMER, "Design and Implementation of the Mote Mapping Service", VISION.BC.EDU, (20000516), URL: http://vision.bc.edu/-dmartin/papers/motes> | - RADU STOLERU; TIAN HE; JOHN STANKOVIC, "Walking GPS: A practical solution for localisation in manually deployed wireless sensor networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 29TH ANNUAL IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON LOCAL COMPUTER NETWORKS, (20041118), pages 480 - 489, XP002448768 |