EP1729462 - Policy based routing using a fast filter processor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92618-7013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalkunte, Mohan 1538 Magpie Lane Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
Buduma, Venkateshwar 593 Crystalberry Tr. San Jose, CA 95129 / US | 03 /
Baden, Eric A. 20325 Argonaut Drive Saratoga, CA 95060 / US | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/49] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06006943.2 | 31.03.2006 | [2006/49] | Priority number, date | US20050686400P | 02.06.2005 Original published format: US 686400 P | US20050289687 | 30.11.2005 Original published format: US 289687 | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1729462 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1729462 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L45/742 (EP,US);
H04L69/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/33] |
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Richtlinienbasierte Leitweglenkung unter Verwendung eines Prozessors zur schnellen Filterung | [2006/49] | English: | Policy based routing using a fast filter processor | [2006/49] | French: | Achemninement basé sur directives utilisant un processeur de filtrage rapide | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002010791 (KALKUNTE MOHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,2,10 * * page 1, paragraph 9 * * page 7, paragraphs 132,134 * * page 10, paragraph 198 * * page 11, paragraphs 206,212 * * page 12, paragraph 228 * * page 13, paragraph 229 * * page 15, paragraph 267 * * page 17, paragraph 283 *; | [A]US2004236720 (BASSO CLAUDE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 4 * * page 1, paragraphs 6,11 * * page 3, paragraph 31 * * page 5, paragraphs 55,66 * * page 6, paragraph 95 * * page 7, paragraphs 97,98 * * page 8, paragraph 124 *; | [A]US2005076010 (BASS BRIAN MITCHELL [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * * page 2, paragraph 10 * * page 3, paragraph 39 * * page 4, paragraph 62 * * page 5, paragraph 73 * * page 6, paragraph 89 ** page 7, paragraph 107 * | by applicant | US2002010791 |