EP1693832 - Method and apparatus for embedding data in encoded voice code [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/34] | Method, apparatus and system for embedding data in and extracting data from encoded voice code | ||
[2009/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/52] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ota, Yasuji C/O Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Masanao c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Tsuchinaga, Yoshiteru C/O Fujitsu Kyushu Network Tech. Ltd. 2-1, Momochihama 2-chome Sawara-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Masakiyo c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Sasaki, Shigeru c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/52] |
Former [2006/38] | 01 /
Ota, Yasuji c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Suzuki, Masanao c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
Tsuchinaga, Yoshiteru Fujitsu Kyushu Network Tech. Ltd. 2-1, Momochihama 2-chome Sawara-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP | |||
04 /
Tanaka, Masakiyo c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
05 /
Sasaki, Shigeru c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
Former [2006/34] | 01 /
Ota, Yasuji c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Suzuki, Masanao c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
Tsuchinaga, Yoshiteru Fujitsu Kyushu Digital Tech. Ltd. 22-8, Hakataekimae 3-chome Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-0011 / JP | |||
04 /
Tanaka, Masakiyo c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
05 /
Sasaki, Shigeru c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Wilding, Frances Ward, et al HASELTINE LAKE Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06007029.9 | 03.02.2003 | [2006/34] | Priority number, date | JP20020026958 | 04.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002026958 | JP20030015538 | 24.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003015538 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1693832 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1693832 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1693832 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
G10L19/018 (EP);
G10L19/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Dateneinbettung in einen kodierten Sprachkode | [2009/29] | English: | Method and apparatus for embedding data in encoded voice code | [2009/29] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'insertion de données dans un code vocal codé | [2009/29] |
Former [2006/34] | Verfahren, Vorrichtung und System zur Dateneinbettung in einen und Datenextraktion aus einem kodierten Sprachkode | ||
Former [2006/34] | Method, apparatus and system for embedding data in and extracting data from encoded voice code | ||
Former [2006/34] | Procédé, appareil et système d'insertion de données dans un code vocal codé et d'extraction de données à partir de celui-ci | Examination procedure | 14.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 13.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03250682.6 / EP1333424 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9609708 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]JPH11296200 (M KEN KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP1020848 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1049259 (KOWA CO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 9, line 10 - line 28 * * page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 1 * |