EP1707909 - Percolation of hygroscopic bulk material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qatar Fertiliser Company (S.A.Q.) P.O.Box 50001 Doha / QA | [2006/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soyez, Werner c/o P.O.Box 50001 Doha / QA | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | de Justo Vàzquez, Jorge M., et al Jacobacci & Partners M & J De Justo Castellana 128 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | de Justo Vàzquez, Jorge M., et al Jacobacci & Partners M. & J. de Justo Castellana 128 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06007073.7 | 03.04.2006 | [2006/40] | Priority number, date | QA20040200545 | 02.04.2005 Original published format: QA 20054504 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1707909 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1707909 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F26B9/10 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
F26B9/103 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Title | German: | Perkolation von hygroskopischem Schüttgut. | [2006/40] | English: | Percolation of hygroscopic bulk material | [2006/40] | French: | Percolation de matériau hygroscopique en vrac | [2006/40] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 26.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/32] | 19.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 26.08.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.08.2008 | 30.04.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2703936 (HUT ROELF W) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-5; | [YA]EP0936430 (VERHEECKE ERIC JULIEN [FR]) [Y] 2-5 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [X]WO0106190 (MYLA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 6 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0835856 (THOENI INDUSTRIEBETRIEBE GMBH [AT]) [X] 6 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2095805 (BOSWELL ALEXANDER BRUCE, et al) [X] 7,8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1778238 (WIENEKE FRANZ) [X] 7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US1647863 (GALBRAITH HARRY F) [A] 6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2828989 (COURTOIS JEAN MARIE [FR]); | [A]FR2628517 (INOR [FR]); | [A]FR2675981 (GAILLAN ROBERT [FR]); | [A]FR1219793 (BROYARD); | [A]GB493993 (AUGUST GRONERT) |