EP1717726 - Radio frequency identification reader, radio frequency identification tag, and method for identifying RFID tags [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/44] | Radio frequency identification reader, radio frequency identification tag, system and method for identifying RFID tags | ||
[2008/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Jin-Young 1104-201, Hyundai 11th Apartment Gwangjang-dong Gwangjin-gu Seoul / KR | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06007222.0 | 05.04.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | KR20050031857 | 18.04.2005 Original published format: KR 20050031857 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1717726 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717726 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
G06K7/10039 (EP,US);
F21V1/16 (KR);
F21V1/02 (KR);
F21V17/105 (KR);
G06K7/0008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL, SE [2007/28] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | RFID-Lesegerät, RFID-Etikett und Verfahren zur RFID-Etikettenidentifizierung | [2008/07] | English: | Radio frequency identification reader, radio frequency identification tag, and method for identifying RFID tags | [2008/07] | French: | Lecteur d'identification de radiofréquence, étiquette d'identification de radiofréquence et méthode pour l'identification des étiquettes RFID | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/44] | RFID-Lesegerät, RFID-Etikett sowie System und Verfahren zur RFID-Etikettenidentifizierung | ||
Former [2006/44] | Radio frequency identification reader, radio frequency identification tag, system and method for identifying RFID tags | ||
Former [2006/44] | Lecteur d'identification de radiofréquence, étiquette d'identification de radiofréquence, système et méthode pour l'identification des étiquettes RFID | Examination procedure | 26.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 23.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.06.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 16.07.2008 | NL | 16.07.2008 | SE | 16.10.2008 | [2010/13] |
Former [2009/17] | FI | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | NL | 16.07.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0779520 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [A]US6538563 (HENG KWEE TONG [SG]); | [A]US2003151497 (COLE PETER HAROLD [AU], et al); |