EP1712495 - Device for the transfert of continuous conveyed printed products from a flat lying position to a vertical position or vice versa [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolbus GmbH & Co. KG Osnabrücker Strasse 77 32369 Rahden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Kolbus GmbH & Co. KG Osnabrücker Strasse 77 D-32369 Rahden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Freden, Christoph Scholer Weg 44 27252 Schwaförden / DE | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Großhandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 06007549.6 | 11.04.2006 | [2006/42] | Priority number, date | DE20051017159 | 14.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005017159 | [2006/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1712495 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1712495 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1712495 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/248, B65H29/12, B42C19/08 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
B42C19/08 (EP,US);
B65G47/248 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2009/01] |
Former [2006/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Überführen von kontinuierlich geförderten Druckprodukten aus einer flachliegenden Position in eine stehende Position oder umgekehrt | [2006/42] | English: | Device for the transfert of continuous conveyed printed products from a flat lying position to a vertical position or vice versa | [2006/42] | French: | Dispositif de transfert de produits imprimés délivrés de manière continue d'une position couchée à une position verticale ou inversement | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.04.2010
26.04.2010
ADMISSIBLE Müller Martini Holding AG Sonnenbergstrasse 13 6052 Hergiswil / CH Opponent's representative Sutter, Kurt, et al, et al E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.04.2010
Müller Martini Holding AG Sonnenbergstrasse 13 6052 Hergiswil / CH Opponent's representative Sutter, Kurt, et al, et al E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | 28.05.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.09.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.10.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/12] | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 22.07.2009 | LI | 22.07.2009 | GB | 11.04.2010 | FR | 30.04.2010 | [2012/33] |
Former [2012/20] | CH | 22.07.2009 | |
LI | 22.07.2009 | ||
GB | 11.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | GB | 11.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05278839 (TERUNUMA HIROYUKIX) [X] 1,2,4,5,14,15 * abstract *; | [X]DE10135659 (KOLBUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 8 - line 29; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE960257 (ENZINGER UNION WERKE AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19757717 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4411350 (WOLFRAM FRANK [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB890595 (CIE DE PONT A MOUSSON) [A] 1,9-13 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | DE2943260 | DE3006266 | JPH05278839 | CH468923 |