EP1714785 - Shaft bore for engaging a sleeve of a blanket cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technotrans AG Robert-Linnemann-Strasse 17 48336 Sassenberg / DE | [2006/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfitzmaier, Thomas Dr.-Hoh-Strasse 18 86514 Ustersbach / DE | [2006/43] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/43] | Steinmeister, Helmut Patentanwälte TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 06007701.3 | 12.04.2006 | [2006/43] | Priority number, date | DE20051018848 | 22.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005018848 | [2006/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1714785 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1714785 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41F30/04 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
B41F30/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/27] |
Former [2006/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Trägerwelle für die Aufnahme der Wickelkernhülsen von Tuchrollen | [2006/43] | English: | Shaft bore for engaging a sleeve of a blanket cylinder | [2006/43] | French: | Noyeau de cylindre pour l'enfilement d'un manchon de cylindre blanchet | [2006/43] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 26.04.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.09.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 22.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 10.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 10.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.07.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1230190 (MCINDOE JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002040651 (MCEACHERN DAVID A [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3639959 (BAGLEY DONALD H, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |