EP1721799 - Method and device for a time optimized filling of the autonomous airpressure brakes of rail vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.2009 [2009/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEW Blankenburg GmbH Weinbergstrasse 22 38889 Blankenburg / DE | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Few Blankenburg GmbH Weinbergstrasse 22 38889 Blankenburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Dietmar An der Wetterseite 7A 38889 Blankenburg / DE | 02 /
Fieck, Harald Am Helsungerweg 14 38889 Blankenburg / DE | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Zinken-Sommer, Rainer Deutsche Bahn AG HLM 4 - Patentabteilung Richelstrasse 3 80634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Zinken-Sommer, Rainer Deutsche Bahn AG Patentabteilung Völckerstrasse 5 80939 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | Zinken-Sommer, Rainer Deutsche Bahn AG Patentabteilung Völckerstrasse 5 80939 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06007934.0 | 15.04.2006 | [2006/46] | Priority number, date | DE20051022365 | 10.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005022365 | [2006/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1721799 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1721799 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/22 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
B60T17/228 (EP);
B60T13/365 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI [2007/29] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum zeitoptimalen Auffüllen der selbsttätigen Druckluftbremsen von Eisenbahnfahrzeugen | [2006/46] | English: | Method and device for a time optimized filling of the autonomous airpressure brakes of rail vehicles | [2006/46] | French: | Méthode et dispositif à remplissage optimalisé en temps des freins à air comprimé de véhicules ferroviaires | [2006/46] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.06.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10058307 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1-7 * column 3, lines 55-63 * * column 4, lines 4-6 *; | [X]DE10133910 (DEUTSCHE BAHN AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] *; | [PA]EP1645481 (FEW BLANKENBURG GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-7* the whole document * |