EP1870489 - Method to obtain a corrosion-resistant and shiny substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ropal AG Untermüli 9 6302 Zug / CH | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koch, Matthias Schwalbenstrasse 10 59969 Bromskirchen / DE | 02 /
Wübbeling, Guido Sternstrasse 39 35066 Frankenberg / DE | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Metten, Karl-Heinz Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Metten, Karl-Heinz Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Metten, Karl-Heinz Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06008081.9 | 19.04.2006 | [2007/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1870489 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1870489 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/25] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1870489 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/58, C23C14/16, C23C22/34, C23C22/36 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
C23C14/165 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/024 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/021 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/5806 (EP,KR,US);
C23C22/34 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T50/60 (US);
Y10T428/12493 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12736 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines korrosionsgeschützten und hochglänzenden Substrats | [2007/52] | English: | Method to obtain a corrosion-resistant and shiny substrate | [2007/52] | French: | Méthode d'obtention d'un substrat brillant et anti-corrosion | [2012/21] |
Former [2007/52] | méthode d'obtention d'un substrat brillant et anti-corrosion | Examination procedure | 16.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.2009
ADMISSIBLE METEC GmbH Breitwiesenstrasse 6 36381 Schlüchtern / DE Opponent's representative Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.2009
ADMISSIBLE METEC GmbH Breitwiesenstrasse 6 36381 Schlüchtern / DE Opponent's representative Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | 27.04.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.05.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.08.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2011 | 14.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.11.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.01.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.01.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 24.07.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.06.2008 | DK | 18.06.2008 | EE | 18.06.2008 | IE | 18.06.2008 | LT | 18.06.2008 | LV | 18.06.2008 | RO | 18.06.2008 | SI | 18.06.2008 | SK | 18.06.2008 | BG | 18.09.2008 | GR | 19.09.2008 | IS | 18.10.2008 | AT | 19.04.2009 | LU | 19.04.2009 | BE | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2015/21] |
Former [2013/23] | CY | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
GR | 19.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
AT | 19.04.2009 | ||
LU | 19.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | DK | 18.06.2008 | |
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
GR | 19.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
AT | 19.04.2009 | ||
LU | 19.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | DK | 18.06.2008 | |
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
GR | 19.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
AT | 19.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/40] | DK | 18.06.2008 | |
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
AT | 19.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | DK | 18.06.2008 | |
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | DK | 18.06.2008 | |
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 18.06.2008 | |
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | LT | 18.06.2008 | |
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | LT | 18.06.2008 | |
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 18.06.2008 | |
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | LV | 18.06.2008 | |
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 18.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0178020 (PARKER CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 15-19,21-24,26 * examples 1-3; claim 1 * [A] 1-14; | [X]US5073403 (KAGECHIKA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 15-19,21,26* column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 2; example 4; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US2004020565 (MELZER JEFFREY I [US], et al) [X] 15-26 * examples 1,2; claims 1,11,12 *; | [X]EP1455001 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 15-19,21-24,26 * examples 1-4; claims 1-6,12; tables 1-8 * | by applicant | US2825697 | US2928763 | DE19702566 | WO0151681 | DE10049005 | DE10149148 | DE10210269 | WO2004014646 | DE10332744 | DE60200458T | US6896920 | Opposition | WO20057061761 | DE4317217 | EP1200641 | US6896970 | DE102004006127 | DE60127921T | - PROF.DR. R.ZENGERLE, Mikrosystemtechnik: Technologien & Prozesse, vol. 4 | - "Physikalissche Gasphasenabscheidung", URL: www.Wikipedia | - DR. R. REUSCHLING, "Vakuum-Dünnschichttechnik" | - "Salzsprühtest", URL: www.wikipedia |