EP1722412 - Jet generator and electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/34] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokomizo, Kanji c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ishikawa, Hiroichi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Makino, Takuya c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Nakayama, Norikazu c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Mukasa, Tomoharu c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2012/29] |
Former [2012/10] | 01 /
Yokomizo, Kanji c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Ishikawa, Hiroichi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Makino, Takuya c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Nakayama, Norikazu c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
Mukasa, Tomoharu c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2006/46] | 01 /
Yokomizo, Kanji Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Ishikawa, Hiroichi Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Makino, Takuya Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Nakayama, Norikazu Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
Mukasa, Tomoharu Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06008113.0 | 19.04.2006 | [2006/46] | Priority number, date | JP20050134302 | 02.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005134302 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1722412 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1722412 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1722412 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/46, B05B17/06, G06F1/20 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
G06F1/203 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/181 (KR);
G06F1/206 (KR);
H05K7/20136 (KR);
G06F2200/201 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/40] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sprühstrahlvorrichtung mit entsprechendem elektronischen Gerät | [2006/49] | English: | Jet generator and electronic device | [2006/46] | French: | Système de jet d' atomisation et dispositif electronique associé | [2006/46] |
Former [2006/46] | Sprühstrahlvorrichtung mit entsprechendem electonischen Gerät | Examination procedure | 21.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 24.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 19.04.2013 | FR | 30.04.2013 | [2014/11] |
Former [2014/09] | GB | 19.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3373752 (KIYOSHI INOUE) [X] 1,6,11,12,15 * abstract * [A] 2-5,7-10,13,14,16,17; | [A]US4350838 (HARROLD RONALD T) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [XA]US6367470 (DENYER JONATHAN STANLEY HAROLD [GB], et al) [X] 1,6,11,12,15 * column 2, paragraph 42 - column 4, paragraph 45; figure 9 * * column 4, paragraph 4 - paragraph 10 * * column 5, paragraph 6 - paragraph 18 * [A] 2-5,7-10,13,14,16,17; | [A]US2005056030 (BASH CULLEN E [US], et al) [A] 1-17* abstract * | by applicant | US560030 | US3373752 | US4350838 | US6367470 |