EP1718119 - Magnetron for microwave oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ochiai, Hiroshi Matsushita Electric Indust.Co., Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
Saitou, Etsuo Matsushita Electric Indust.Co., Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Yoshimasa Matsushita Electric Ind. Co., Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 04 /
Kuwahara, Nagisa Matsushita Electric Ind. Co., Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06008116.3 | 19.04.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | JP20050128194 | 26.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005128194 | JP20050251881 | 31.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005251881 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1718119 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1718119 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/72, H01J23/15 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
H01J23/15 (EP,US);
H01J23/54 (EP,US);
H05B6/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/28] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Magnetron für Mikrowellenherd | [2006/44] | English: | Magnetron for microwave oven | [2006/44] | French: | Magnétron pour four à micro-ondes | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 21.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 08.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 08.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0696878 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,2,7,8 * * column 5, lines 21-24 * * column 8, lines 37-53 *; | [A]EP1261015 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPS5717344B |