EP1745983 - Interior trim for an automobile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 71287 Weissach / DE | ||
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benkler, Olaf Schönblickstrasse 17/1 75242 Neuhausen/Schellbronn / DE | [2007/04] | Application number, filing date | 06008252.6 | 21.04.2006 | [2007/04] | Priority number, date | DE20051033656 | 19.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005033656 | [2007/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1745983 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1745983 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/02 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
B60R13/0815 (EP);
B60R13/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT [2007/39] |
Former [2007/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Innenverkleidung für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2007/04] | English: | Interior trim for an automobile | [2007/04] | French: | Cache intèrieure pour véhicule automobile | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 28.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.01.2010 | ES | 01.05.2010 | [2010/40] |
Former [2010/33] | ES | 01.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS58183330 ; | [A]DE19521593 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,2,4 *; | [X]EP1369304 (METZELER AUTOMOTIVE PROFILES [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE10254349 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]); | [A]EP1384628 (CERA [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0036] - [0043] *; | [X]DE10340896 (SAI AUTOMOTIVE SAL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7,8 * figures 1,2b,3a; claims 1,15 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840203), vol. 008, no. 026, Database accession no. (M - 273), & JP58183330 A 19831026 (NIHON SEKISOO KOGYO KK) [X] 1,6 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1369304 | DE10254349 | DE10340896 |