EP1720191 - Focusing lens structure for a cathode ray tube electron gun [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lefort, Michel 5 rue Nouvelle 21110 Varanges / FR | 02 /
Klinguer, Bruno 43 Quai Galliot 21000 Dijon / FR | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/45] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson, 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06008396.1 | 24.04.2006 | [2006/45] | Priority number, date | FR20050051165 | 03.05.2005 Original published format: FR 0551165 | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720191 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1720191 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/50 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
H01J29/503 (EP,US);
H01J29/48 (KR);
H01J29/62 (EP,US);
H01J2229/481 (EP,US);
H01J2229/5635 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/28] |
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fokussierungslinse für eine Elektronenkanone einer Kathodenstrahlröhre | [2006/45] | English: | Focusing lens structure for a cathode ray tube electron gun | [2006/45] | French: | Structure de lentille de focalisation pour canon à électrons pour tube à rayons cathodiques | [2006/45] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4812706 (BAUDRY JACQUES [FR], et al) [Y] 5 * column 2, lines 55-68; figure 3 *; | [A]US4833365 (SHIRAI SHOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* figure 9; claims 1-15 *; | [XY]US5659225 (TSURUOKA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8 * column 4, lines 27-50; figures 6-9 * [Y] 5 |