EP1717762 - Coin dispensing method for coin dispensing device and coin dispensing device, and coin recycling machine using the coin dispensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI SEIKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Aoyama Tower Bldg. 2F, 2-24-15 Minami Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Yutaka c/o Saitama Factory of Asahi Seiko Kabushiki Kaisha 3-7, Kokaba 1-chome Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Kawauchi, Shigeo c/o Saitama Factory of Asahi Seiko Kabushiki Kaisha 3-7, Kokaba 1-chome Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [2010/08] |
Former [2010/06] | 01 /
Sato, Yutaka Saitama Factory of Asahi Seiko 3-7, Kokaba 1-chome Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi Saitama-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kawauchi, Shigeo Saitama Factory of Asahi Seiko 3-7, Kokaba 1-chome Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi Saitama-ken / JP | |||
Former [2006/44] | 01 /
Sato, Yutaka Saitama Factory of asahi Seiko 3-7, Kokaba 1-chome Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi Saitama-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kawauchi, Shigeo Saitama Factory of asahi Seiko 3-7, Kokaba 1-chome Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi Saitama-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Feldmeier, Jürgen, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Feldmeier, Jürgen, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06008926.5 | 28.04.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | JP20050133478 | 28.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005133478 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1717762 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717762 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G07D9/00, G07F5/24 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
G07D9/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/28] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Münzausgabeverfahren für eine Münzausgabevorrichtung, Münzausgabevorrichtung und Münzrecyclingmaschine mit der Münzausgabevorrichtung | [2006/44] | English: | Coin dispensing method for coin dispensing device and coin dispensing device, and coin recycling machine using the coin dispensing device | [2006/44] | French: | Procédé de distribution de monnaie dans le dispositif, distributeur de monnaie et machine de recyclage de la monnaie utilisant le dispositif distributeur de monnaie | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 20.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]JP2000076507 ; | [X]US3948279 (GUPTA ASHOK K) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * column 1, line 23 - line 64 ** column 10, line 26 - column 11, line 28 *; | [XY]US4441515 (GOEPNER SIEGFRIED E [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 15, line 21 - line 62 * * column 18, line 28 - line 35 * * column 20, line 22 - column 21, line 34 * * column 29, line 22 - line 29 * [Y] 5 | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000076507 A 20000314 (JAPAN SERVO CO LTD) [DY] 5 * abstract * |