EP1721637 - Cosmetic sheet for removing keratotic plugs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [2006/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konno, Eriko Nitto Denko Corp. 1-2-1, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Kasahara, Tsuyoshi Nitto Denko Corp. 1-2-1, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | 03 /
Hatanaka, Hiroshi Nitto Denko Corp. 1-2-1, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | 04 /
Funahashi, Miki Nitto Denko Corp. 1-2-1, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06008975.2 | 28.04.2006 | [2006/46] | Priority number, date | JP20050135722 | 09.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005135722 | JP20050235286 | 15.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005235286 | JP20050255270 | 02.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005255270 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1721637 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/00, A61K8/02, A61K8/37, A61K8/81 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
A61K8/4993 (EP,US);
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A61K8/8176 (EP,US);
A61K8/8182 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Title | German: | Kosmetische Folie zum Entfernen von keratösen Komedonen | [2006/46] | English: | Cosmetic sheet for removing keratotic plugs | [2006/46] | French: | Feuille cosmétique permettant d'éliminer les comédons kératosiques | [2006/46] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 18.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/13] | 07.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JP2005314237 ; | [A]EP0947189 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5985299 (BUERGER DOUGLAS E [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0965332 (LINTEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US6159493 (CHEN SHU-JUAN [TW], et al) [X] 1,6,8,10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US6174536 (CROTTY BRIAN ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US6306382 (UEMURA TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2005314237 A 20051110 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [PX] 1-16 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH05221843 | JPH11199435 | US6159493 |