EP1720286 - Network management system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Won-Jong 101-806, Seongji Apt. Gwonseon-dong Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Cho, Sang-Gil 806-2005, Byeokjeokgol 8-danji Apt. Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/51] |
Former [2006/45] | 01 /
Yang, Won-Jong 101-806, Seongji Apt. Gwonseon-dong Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Cho, Sang-Gil 806-2005, Byeokjeokgol 8-danji Apt. Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/11] | Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2006/45] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06009124.6 | 03.05.2006 | [2006/45] | Priority number, date | KR20050038151 | 06.05.2005 Original published format: KR 20050038151 | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1720286 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1720286 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | [2010/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1720286 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
H04L41/00 (EP,US);
H04L41/0213 (EP,KR,US);
H04L41/0226 (EP,KR,US);
H04L41/0233 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/51] |
Former [2011/26] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Netzwerkverwaltung | [2006/45] | English: | Network management system and method | [2006/45] | French: | Système et méthode de gestion de réseau | [2006/45] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 20.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.05.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5870749 (ADUSUMILLI PANDURANGA RAO [US]) [A] 1-18 * figures 1,4,8 * * claims 1,2 * * column 1, lines 6-17 * * column 12, line 38 - column 13, line 54 * * abstract ** column 21, line 1 - column 22, line 10 *; | [X]WO0076228 (FUJITSU NETWORK COMMUNICATIONS [US]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 6 * * page 5, line 15 - page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 10, line 17 - page 12, paragraph 9 * * figures 1,4 *; | [X]EP1389850 (SOFTWARE AG [DE]) [X] 1-18 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0055] * * abstract * |