EP1720021 - Measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prefag Carl Rivoir GmbH & Co . Fabrik für Präzisionskleinteile KG Prefagstrasse 4 75045 Walzbachtal / DE | [2006/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rivoir, Dirk Bei den Dolinen 3 75245 Neulingen-Göbrichen / DE | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Pfister, Stefan Helmut Ulrich, et al Pfister & Pfister Patent & Rechtsanwälte Hallhof 6-7 87700 Memmingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | Pfister, Stefan Helmut Ulrich, et al Pfister & Pfister Patent-& Rechtsanwälte Hallhof 6-7 87700 Memmingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06009219.4 | 04.05.2006 | [2006/45] | Priority number, date | DE20051021350 | 04.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005021350 | [2006/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720021 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01R5/00, G01D13/00 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
G01D13/00 (EP,US);
G01D2213/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/28] |
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Messvorrichtung | [2006/45] | English: | Measuring device | [2006/45] | French: | Dispositif de mesure | [2006/45] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/08] | 19.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.06.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.06.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4879510 (ITOH AKIO [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,10,11,13 * column 2, lines 16-26; figures 1-4 * * column 3, lines 9-45 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 29 * * column 6, line 28 - column 7, line 21 * * column 8, lines 20-42 * [A] 6,8,9,12,14; | [A]DE19837824 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-14* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XA]US6741184 (MILLER MARK J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10,11,13 * column 1, lines 38-56; figures 1-5 * * column 2, lines 11-63 * [A] 5-9,12,14; | [XA]US2004261688 (MACGREGOR RODERICK [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,10,11,13 * paragraphs [0008] , [0049] - [0057]; figure 8 * [A] 6,8,9,12,14 |