EP1721642 - Roulette and method for controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Entertainment Corporation Ariake Frontier Building, Tower A 3-7-26 Ariake, Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Universal Entertainment Corporation Ariake Frontier Building, Tower A, 3-7-26 Ariake, Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Aruze Corp. 3-1-25, Ariake, Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokota, Tetsuya c/o ARUZE CORP. 3-1-25, Ariake Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06009259.0 | 04.05.2006 | [2006/46] | Priority number, date | JP20050140051 | 12.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005140051 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1721642 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1721642 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A63F5/04 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
A63F5/0082 (EP,KR,US);
A63F5/00 (EP,US);
G07F17/3202 (EP,KR,US);
G07F17/3286 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2009/009 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Title | German: | Roulette und dazugehöriges Steuerungsverfahren | [2006/46] | English: | Roulette and method for controlling the same | [2006/46] | French: | Roulette et méthode pour la commander | [2006/46] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 14.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.12.2009
13.01.2010
ADMISSIBLE CAMMEGH LIMITED Old Surrenden Manor-Bethersden Kent TN26 3DL / GB Opponent's representative Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.12.2009
13.01.2010
ADMISSIBLE CAMMEGH LIMITED Old Surrenden Manor-Bethersden Kent TN26 3DL / GB Opponent's representative Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | 08.02.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.07.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.08.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.09.2011 | 19.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 29.08.2011 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2012/01] | 15.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.04.2009 | CY | 01.04.2009 | CZ | 01.04.2009 | DK | 01.04.2009 | EE | 01.04.2009 | FI | 01.04.2009 | LT | 01.04.2009 | LV | 01.04.2009 | NL | 01.04.2009 | PL | 01.04.2009 | RO | 01.04.2009 | SI | 01.04.2009 | SK | 01.04.2009 | TR | 01.04.2009 | IE | 04.05.2009 | LU | 04.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | BG | 01.07.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | GR | 02.07.2009 | IS | 01.08.2009 | PT | 02.09.2009 | HU | 02.10.2009 | CH | 31.05.2010 | LI | 31.05.2010 | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/32] | BE | 01.04.2009 | |
CZ | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
LV | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 04.05.2009 | ||
LU | 04.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
HU | 02.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | BE | 01.04.2009 | |
CZ | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
LV | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 04.05.2009 | ||
LU | 04.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | BE | 01.04.2009 | |
CZ | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
LV | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 04.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | BE | 01.04.2009 | |
CZ | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
LV | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 04.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | BE | 01.04.2009 | |
CZ | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
LV | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 04.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | BE | 01.04.2009 | |
CZ | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
LV | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | BE | 01.04.2009 | |
CZ | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
LV | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | EE | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
LV | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | EE | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
LV | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH08229191 ; | [A]US4906005 (MANABE KATSUKI [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 4 - column 6, line 38; figure - *; | [A]US6520854 (MCNALLY GORDON [GB]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 49 - column 5, line 36; figure - *; | [A]WO03051476 (CAMMEGH LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 25; figure - * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08229191 A 19960910 (TAIHEI GIKEN KOGYO KK) [AD] 1-14 * abstract * |