EP1721821 - Bicycle chainring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77, Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tabe, Koshi 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 589-8577 / JP | 02 /
Tetsuka, Toshio 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 589-8577 / JP | 03 /
Yamanaka, Masahiro 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 589-8577 / JP | 04 /
Shiraishi, Shingo 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 589-8577 / JP | 05 /
Inoue, Hideya 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 589-8577 / JP | 06 /
Nishimoto, Yusuke 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 589-8577 / JP | 07 /
Emura, Atsuhiro 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 589-8577 / JP | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Grosse, Bockhorni & Schumacher, Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06009261.6 | 04.05.2006 | [2006/46] | Priority number, date | US20050126143 | 11.05.2005 Original published format: US 126143 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1721821 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1721821 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | [2007/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1721821 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62M9/10, F16H55/30 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
B62M9/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2008/12] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kettenblatt für ein Fahrrad | [2006/46] | English: | Bicycle chainring | [2006/46] | French: | Roue dentée pour bicyclette | [2006/46] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1013843 (GEORGES NAVET) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]US5314366 (PALM KIRBY A [US]) [X] 1-16 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 17; figures 1,4 *; | [X]EP0764575 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [X] 1-17,21-25 * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 40; figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP0765802 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [X] 1-16,20 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 43; figures 2-4 *; | [X]EP1407962 (CAMPAGNOLO SRL [IT]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018]; figures 2,3,5 *; | [A]US2004092352 (CHIANG CHENG-HSUN [TW]) [A] 5* paragraph [0011]; figure 2 * |