EP1852909 - Process for integrating a non-volatile memory cell into a HV CMOS process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states austriamicrosystems AG Schloss Premstätten 8141 Unterpremstätten / AT | [2007/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leisenberger, Friedrich Peter Inge-Morath-Strasse 13c 8045 Graz / AT | 02 /
Park, Jong Mun Merangasse 29-12 8010 Graz / AT | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06009365.5 | 05.05.2006 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1852909 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8247, H01L27/105, H01L29/423, H01L21/336 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
H10B41/40 (EP);
H10B41/49 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/29] |
Former [2007/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Integration einer nichtflüchtigen Speicherzelle in einen HV CMOS Prozess | [2007/45] | English: | Process for integrating a non-volatile memory cell into a HV CMOS process | [2007/45] | French: | Procédé d'integration d'une cellule de mémoire non-volatile dans un procédé CMOS à haute tension | [2007/45] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/45] | 17.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0610643 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [Y]US5911105 (SASAKI MASAKAZU [JP]) [Y] 9,10 * abstract *; | [Y]US5911104 (SMAYLING MICHAEL C [US], et al) [Y] 9-11 * abstract *; | [XY]US6689653 (SEAH XAVIER TEO LENG [SG], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 52 - line 55 * * column 3, line 25 - line 40 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 13 * * column 4, line 26 - line 29 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 43 * [Y] 9-11 |