EP1737091 - Overvoltage arrester, comprising a rail mountable basis part with electric connection pins as well as an exchangeable insert part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Opposition rejected | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEHN + SÖHNE GMBH + CO KG Hans-Dehn-Strasse 1 92318 Neumarkt/Opf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states DEHN + SÖHNE GMBH + CO KG Hans-Dehn-Strasse 1 D-92318 Neumarkt/Opf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zahlmann, Peter, Dr.Ing. Johann-Mois-Ring 15A 92318 Neumarkt / DE | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06009455.4 | 08.05.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | DE20052007771U | 18.05.2005 Original published format: DE 202005007771 U | DE20052009123U | 10.06.2005 Original published format: DE 202005009123 U | [2006/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1737091 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1737091 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01T1/12, H01C7/12 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
H01T1/12 (EP);
H01T1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Title | German: | Überspannungsableiter, umfassend ein schienenmontierbares Basisteil mit elektrischer Anschlussklemmen sowie ein auswechselbares Einsteckteil | [2006/52] | English: | Overvoltage arrester, comprising a rail mountable basis part with electric connection pins as well as an exchangeable insert part | [2006/52] | French: | Dérivateur de surtensions, comprenant un élément de base pouvant être monté sur un rail et pourvu de broches de connexion électrique ainsi que d' un module enfichable | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.2008
ADMISSIBLE KIWA spol.s r.o. Priemyselna 2 949 01 Nitra / SK Opponent's representative Musil, Dobroslav Dobroslav Musil a partneri s.r.o. Zabrdovicka 11 615 00 Brno / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.2008
ADMISSIBLE KIWA spol.s r.o. Priemyselna 2 949 01 Nitra / SK Opponent's representative Musil, Dobroslav Cejl 38 602 00 Brno / CZ | 20.06.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.12.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.03.2010 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 03.04.2014 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/21] | Appeal following opposition | 29.04.2010 | Appeal received No. T0960/10 | 30.06.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.04.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.07.2007 | DK | 25.07.2007 | EE | 25.07.2007 | FI | 25.07.2007 | GB | 25.07.2007 | IE | 25.07.2007 | LT | 25.07.2007 | LV | 25.07.2007 | NL | 25.07.2007 | RO | 25.07.2007 | SI | 25.07.2007 | TR | 25.07.2007 | BG | 25.10.2007 | SE | 25.10.2007 | GR | 26.10.2007 | ES | 05.11.2007 | IS | 25.11.2007 | PT | 26.12.2007 | HU | 26.01.2008 | LU | 08.05.2008 | BE | 31.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | AT | 08.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2010 | LI | 31.05.2010 | PL | 08.05.2012 | [2013/36] |
Former [2011/12] | CY | 25.07.2007 | |
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
LV | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
TR | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
HU | 26.01.2008 | ||
LU | 08.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
AT | 08.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | CY | 25.07.2007 | |
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
LV | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
TR | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
HU | 26.01.2008 | ||
LU | 08.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
AT | 08.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 25.07.2007 | |
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
LV | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
LU | 08.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
AT | 08.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CY | 25.07.2007 | |
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
LV | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
AT | 08.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CY | 25.07.2007 | |
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
LV | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
LV | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
LV | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
LV | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
LV | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
LV | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
LV | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
LV | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
LV | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | FI | 25.07.2007 | |
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
LV | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | FI | 25.07.2007 | |
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | LT | 25.07.2007 | |
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 25.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0755582 (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON); | [DA]DE3908236 (DEHN & SOEHNE [DE]); | [DA]EP0845843 (SOULE MATERIEL ELECTR [FR]); | [A]EP0867896 (CITEL [FR]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 48 - column 10, line 26; figure 8 *; | [DA]DE10134752 (EPCOS AG [DE]) |