EP1684417 - Method of operating a radio frequency transmitter and apparatus for controlling a radio frequency transmitter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sepura PLC Radio House St. Andrews Road Cambridge CB4 1GR / GB | [2008/23] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Sepura Limited Radio House, St. Andrews Road Cambridge CB4 1GR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rayne, Mark Wentworth 5 St. James Close Stretham Nr. Ely Cambridgeshire CB6 3ND / GB | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Tothill, John Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Tothill, John Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06009630.2 | 17.03.2000 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | GB19990006417 | 19.03.1999 Original published format: GB 9906417 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1684417 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1684417 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/04, H03G3/20, H04B7/005, H03F1/32 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
H03F1/34 (EP);
H03F1/3247 (EP);
H03G3/3047 (EP);
H04L27/364 (EP);
H04L27/368 (EP);
H03F2200/57 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/30] | H03F1/32, H04L27/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Funksenders und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Funksenders | [2006/30] | English: | Method of operating a radio frequency transmitter and apparatus for controlling a radio frequency transmitter | [2006/30] | French: | Procédé pour actionner un émetteur radio et dispositif pour contrôler un émetteur radio | [2006/30] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00911071.9 / EP1163728 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000911071) is 26.08.2004 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.07.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 21.07.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.07.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.03.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.12.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 24.12.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 19.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.2007 | 31.03.2017 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5685909 ; | [X]WO9506354 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4-5,11 * page 5, line 3 - page 8, line 32; figures 2,4; claims 1,4 *; | [XYI]US5524285 (WRAY ANTHONY J [GB], et al) [X] 1,4-7,11-12,15-16 * column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 14; figures 1,2A; claims 1-4 * [Y] 8 [I] 2-3,9-10,13-14; | [Y]US5559807 (VAN DEN HEUVEL ANTHONY P [GB], et al) [Y] 8 * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 4; figures 2,4; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2321574 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-16 * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 28 * * page 9, line 4 - page 10, line 35; figures 2,4,5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810926), vol. 005, no. 153, Database accession no. (E - 76), & JP56085909 A 19810713 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [A] 1,4-5,11 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9506354 | US5524285 |