EP1857983 - Automatic gate with sensor device to detect a person within the gate area [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scheidt & Bachmann Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Breite Strasse 132 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Norbert Dr. Kampsheide 32 41063 Mönchengladbach / DE | 02 /
Sauermann, Michael Im Schlaun 75 41189 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010071.6 | 16.05.2006 | [2007/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1857983 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1857983 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/02, E06B11/08 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
E06B11/085 (EP,US);
G07C9/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Title | German: | Durchgangssperre mit einer die Anwesenheit einer Person innerhalb der Durchgangssperre detektierenden Sensorik | [2007/47] | English: | Automatic gate with sensor device to detect a person within the gate area | [2007/47] | French: | Barrière de passage avec capteur pour détecter la présence d'une personne dans le passage | [2007/47] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 28.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2006 | CY | 29.06.2011 | CZ | 29.06.2011 | EE | 29.06.2011 | LT | 29.06.2011 | LV | 29.06.2011 | PL | 29.06.2011 | RO | 29.06.2011 | SI | 29.06.2011 | SK | 29.06.2011 | TR | 29.06.2011 | BG | 29.09.2011 | IS | 29.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CZ | 29.06.2011 | |
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CZ | 29.06.2011 | |
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CZ | 29.06.2011 | |
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | EE | 29.06.2011 | |
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | LT | 29.06.2011 | |
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 29.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2175348 (WANZL KG RUDOLF) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3837276 (WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK KG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2236179 (READING HUGO FREDERICK) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9314530U (WANZL ENTWICKLUNG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9320892U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-8* page 7, lines 10-28; claims 10,11 *; | [A]US5414249 (MATSUMOTO KOZO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,5 * |