EP1736288 - Process for cutting cheese portions having constant or predetermined weight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gelmini, Antonio Via G. Di Vittorio 19 43013 Langhirano (Parma) / IT | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | ||
Former [2006/52] | Guareschi, Antonella c/o Ing. Dallaglio S.r.l. Viale Mentana 92 43100 Parma / IT | Application number, filing date | 06010150.8 | 17.05.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | IT2005PR00029 | 03.06.2005 Original published format: IT pr20050029 | [2006/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1736288 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/30, B26D5/00 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
B26D7/30 (EP);
B26D5/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/36] |
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schneiden von Käseportionen mit einem konstanten oder vorgegebenen Gewicht | [2006/52] | English: | Process for cutting cheese portions having constant or predetermined weight | [2006/52] | French: | Procédé pour la coupe de portions de fromage, lesdites portions ayant un poids constant ou predeterminé | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2632098 (CERISY SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4410596 (WENTE HOLGER DR ING [DE], et al) [X] 1,2* the whole document *; | [Y]WO9906796 (R J RES LTD [IE], et al) [Y] 5,10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10342499 (MASCHB HEINRICH HAJEK GMBH & C [AT]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6882434 (SANDBERG GLENN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * the whole document * [Y] 5,10; | [PX]EP1570962 (ALPMA ALPENLAND MASCH [DE]) [PX] 1,2,6 * the whole document * |