EP1731126 - Device for cleaning and air desinfecting of bed pans [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BG Edelstahl und Kunststofftechnik für Krankenhaus Industrie und Wasserwirtschaft GmbH Hubertusstrasse 50 45657 Recklinghausen / DE | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barselak, Peter 29a, Lambertstrasse 44581 Castrop-Rauxel / DE | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2007/12] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2006/50] | Eichelbaum, Lambert Krüppeleichen 6 45659 Recklinghausen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010352.0 | 19.05.2006 | [2006/50] | Priority number, date | DE20051026088 | 07.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005026088 | [2006/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1731126 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1731126 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61G9/02 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
A61G9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Reinigung und Luft-Desinfektion von Stechbecken und Urinflaschen | [2006/50] | English: | Device for cleaning and air desinfecting of bed pans | [2006/50] | French: | Dispositif pour nettoyer et désinfecter l'air des bassins de lit | [2006/50] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/11] | 19.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2900957 (MEIKO MASCH & APP) [Y] 12,13 * page 5, paragraph 5; figure 1 * * page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [A]DE3209305 (SIC AG [CH]) [A] 1-11* page 16, lines 27,28; figure 3 *; | [YD]DE202004017449U (BG EDELSTAHL UND KUNSTSTOFFTEC [DE]) [YD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2005037330 (MEIKO MASCHINENBAU GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [Y] 1-6,12,13 * page 4, lines 17-21; figure 1 * * page 8 * |