EP1729003 - Piston for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Opposition rejected | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KS Kolbenschmidt GmbH Karl-Schmidt-Strasse 74172 Neckarsulm / DE | [2006/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bickle, Wolfgang Friedensstrasse 13 68799 Reilingen / DE | 02 /
Haupert, Frank, Dr. Ing. Lindenstrasse 9 67705 Stelzenberg / DE | 03 /
Schubert, Werner Bergwerkstrasse 23 69168 Wiesloch / DE | 04 /
Bürkle, Gunter, Dr. Im Seeloch 16 71726 Benningen / DE | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2013/30] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/49] | Friz, Oliver Patentanwälte, Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010563.2 | 23.05.2006 | [2006/49] | Priority number, date | DE20051026664 | 02.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005026664 | [2006/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1729003 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1729003 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1729003 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02F3/10 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
F02F3/10 (EP);
F05C2201/021 (EP);
F05C2201/903 (EP);
F05C2225/06 (EP);
F05C2253/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/49] | F02F3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/19] |
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kolben für Brennkraftmaschine | [2006/49] | English: | Piston for an internal combustion engine | [2006/49] | French: | Piston pour un moteur à combustion interne | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 01.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.09.2010
30.09.2010
ADMISSIBLE Federal-Mogul Nürnberg GmbH Nopitschstrasse 67 90441 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 DE-81925 München / DE | [2010/44] | 05.11.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.03.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.09.2015 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/14] | 29.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.11.2015 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.12.2009 | ES | 03.04.2010 | GB | 23.05.2013 | FR | 31.05.2013 | [2014/24] |
Former [2014/21] | IT | 23.12.2009 | |
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
GB | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2011/16] | IT | 23.12.2009 | |
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | ES | 03.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1440718 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1* paragraph [0016] *; | [A]EP1479946 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0112] * |