EP1710827 - Tailored spacer wall coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2007/15] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states Candescent Intellectual Property Services, Inc. 6580 Via Del Oro San Jose, CA 95119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pan, Lawrence S. 251 Kingston Hill Way Los Gatos CA 95032 / US | 02 /
Schropp, Donald R., Jr. 835 Asbury Street San Jose CA 95126 / US | 03 /
Chakarov, Vasil M. 6240 Sager Way San Jose CA 95123 / US | 04 /
O'Reilly, John K. Kilgogy Lower Co. Cavan / IE | 05 /
Hopple, George B. 167 Webster Street Palo Alto CA 94306 / US | 06 /
Spindt, Christopher J. 115 Hillside Avenue Menlo Park CA 94025 / US | 07 /
Barton, Roger W. 24 Country Road, 34 Tofte MN 55615 / US | 08 /
Nystrom, Michael J. 1859 Andrews Avenue San Jose CA 95124 / US | 09 /
Ramesh, Ramamoorthy 12526 Strafford Garden Drive Silver Spring MD 20904 / US | 10 /
Dunphy, James C. 1502 Minnesota Avenue San Jose CA 95125 / US | 11 /
Pei, Shiyou 4194 Hamilton Avenue, Apt. 9 San Jose CA 95130 / US | 12 /
Narayanan, Kollengode 820 Kim Street Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2007/06] |
Former [2006/41] | 01 /
Pan, Lawrence S. 251 Kingston Hill Way Los Gatos CA 95032 / US | ||
02 /
Schropp, Donald R., Jr. 835 Asbury Street San Jose CA 95126 / US | |||
03 /
Chakarov, Vasil M. 6240 Sager Way San Jose CA 95123 / US | |||
04 /
O'Reilly, John K. 617 Eighth Avenue San Francisco CA 94118 / US | |||
05 /
Hopple, George B. 167 Webster Street Palo Alto CA 94306 / US | |||
06 /
Spindt, Christopher J. 115 Hillside Avenue Menlo Park CA 94025 / US | |||
07 /
Barton, Roger W. 24 Country Road, 34 Tofte MN 55615 / US | |||
08 /
Nystrom, Michael J. 1859 Andrews Avenue San Jose CA 95124 / US | |||
09 /
Ramesh, Ramamoorthy 12526 Strafford Garden Drive Silver Spring MD 20904 / US | |||
10 /
Dunphy, James C. 1502 Minnesota Avenue San Jose CA 95125 / US | |||
11 /
Pei, Shiyou 4194 Hamilton Avenue, Apt. 9 San Jose CA 95130 / US | |||
12 /
Narayanan, Kollengode 10480-A Foothill Blvd. Cupertino CA 95014 / US | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al LADAS & PARRY LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010690.3 | 08.01.2001 | [2006/41] | Priority number, date | US20000493697 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: US 493697 | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1710827 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1710827 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1710827 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/02 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
H01J9/242 (EP,US);
H01J1/30 (KR);
H01J19/50 (KR);
H01J29/028 (EP,US);
H01J29/864 (EP,US);
H01J31/123 (EP,US);
H01J2329/864 (EP,US);
H01J2329/8645 (EP,US);
H01J61/30 (EP,US);
H01J61/305 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2006/41] | Title | German: | Angepasste Beschichtungen für einen Wandabstandshalter | [2006/41] | English: | Tailored spacer wall coatings | [2006/41] | French: | Revêtements muraux pour séparateur sur mesure | [2007/06] |
Former [2006/41] | Revetements muraux pour separateur sur mesure | Examination procedure | 16.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01901913.2 / EP1264327 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 20.05.2009 | IE | 08.01.2010 | FR | 01.02.2010 | [2011/08] |
Former [2011/02] | NL | 20.05.2009 | |
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/01] | NL | 20.05.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5872424 (SPINDT CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1; figure 6 * * column 4, line 39 - line 48 *; | [A]US6013980 (GOEL ARVIND [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 38 - line 45; figure 1 * * column 1, line 34 - line 40 * * column 4, line 8 *; | [A]US6013981 (SPINDT CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [A] 1* column 8, line 35; figure 6; claim 5 * | by applicant | US6013980 |