EP1737068 - Wireless local area network communications module and integrated chip package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. L'Horizon Gunsite Road Brittons Hill St. Michael 14027 / BB | [2018/12] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd L'Horizon, Gunsite Road Brittons Hills BB 14027 Saint Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Janofsky, Eric B. 225 West Ferndale Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2018/12] |
Former [2006/52] | 01 /
Janofsky, Eric B. 225 West Ferndale Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/12] |
Former [2006/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010755.4 | 24.05.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | US20050157286 | 21.06.2005 Original published format: US 157286 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1737068 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1737068 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/40, H01Q1/44, H04J1/00, H04L27/00 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
H01Q1/2283 (EP,US);
H01L23/66 (EP,US);
H01Q1/2275 (EP,US);
H01Q1/40 (EP,US);
H01Q1/44 (EP,US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
H01L2223/6677 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16152 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00011, H01L2224/0401 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/0401 (US,EP);
H01L2924/16152, H01L2224/73253 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/12] |
Former [2007/36] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WLAN-Modul und Schaltungschipverpackung | [2006/52] | English: | Wireless local area network communications module and integrated chip package | [2006/52] | French: | Module WLAN et boitier pour circuit intégré | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 22.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005064581 ; | [X]US5023624 (HECKAMAN DOUGLAS E [US], et al) [X] 9-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002167084 (COCCIOLI ROBERTO [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003057545 (SHIM IL KWON [SG], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004008142 (GUO XIAOLING [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004217472 (AISENBREY THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 9-16 * the whole document *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2005064581 A 20050310 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - SERENI E ET AL, "A Software Radio OFDM Transceiver for WLAN applications", INTERNET CITATION, INTERNET, (200104), XP002369287 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | Examination | US2005159114 |