EP1726535 - Package with weakening line and method and device for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 27283 Verden / DE | 02 /
Stiller, Martin Döhlberger Strasse 35 27283 Verden / DE | 03 /
Engel, Gisbert Am Rüstkamp 17 27308 Luttum / DE | 04 /
Krone, Karsten Rotenburger Strasse 1 28832 Achim-Baden / DE | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2006/48] | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 D-28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010805.7 | 26.05.2006 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | US20050137496 | 26.05.2005 Original published format: US 137496 | [2006/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726535 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/68, B65B61/18 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
B65D75/5827 (EP,US);
B65B61/182 (EP,US);
B65D75/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2007/31] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Packung mit Aufreissfaden sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen derselben | [2006/48] | English: | Package with weakening line and method and device for its manufacture | [2006/48] | French: | Emballage avec ligne d'affaiblissement et méthode et appareil pour sa production | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 06.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.09.2007 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 26.09.2007 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 27.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2007 | Observations by third parties | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 26.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2009 | Observations by third parties | 12.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 22.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2010 | Observations by third parties | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/03] | Request for further processing for: | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.07.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8802205U (BAUDISCH, WOLFGANG, DIPL.-ING., 8042 OBERSCHLEISSHEIM, DE) [X] 1,2 * figures 3,4; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0601583 (TABAC FAB REUNIES SA [CH]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 30; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]DE29700830U (OSTMA MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9 * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 3; figure 5; claim 1 *; | [PX]US2005269220 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al) [PX] 1-21* the whole document * | by applicant | EP0395249 | WO03024834 | other | FR2127136 | EP0343857 | EP0395249 | DE29715546U | DE10041020 | WO03024834 |