EP1729211 - Transmission and reception of display information that configures a screen with multiple screen elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix (also trading as Square Enix Co., Ltd.) 6-27-30 Shinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8430 / JP | [2018/41] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix (also trading as Square Enix Co., Ltd.) Shinjuku Bunka Quint Building 3-22-7 Yogogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | ||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix Holdings (also trading as Square Enix Holdings Co., Ltd.) 4-31-8 Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix (also trading as Square Enix Co., Ltd.) 3-22-7, Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minagawa, Hiroshi Square Enix Co., Ltd. 3-22-7 Yoyogi Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | 02 /
Fukushima, Mitsuteru Square Enix Co., Ltd. 3-22-7 Yoyogi Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | 03 /
Tsushima, Tadashi Square Enix Co., Ltd. 3-22-7 Yoyogi Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | [2018/51] |
Former [2006/49] | 01 /
Minagawa, Hiroshi Square Enix Co., Ltd. 3-22-7 Yoyogi Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | ||
02 /
Fukushima, Mitsuteru Square Enix Co., Ltd. 3-22-7 Yoyogi Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | |||
03 /
Tsushima, Tadashi Square Enix Co., Ltd. 3-22-7 Yoyogi Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/51] |
Former [2006/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010856.0 | 26.05.2006 | [2006/49] | Priority number, date | JP20050153124 | 25.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005153124 | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1729211 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1729211 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1729211 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
G06F3/14 (EP,US);
G06F3/147 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
G09G2370/027 (EP,US);
G09G2370/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/51] |
Former [2008/10] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Übertragung und Empfang von Anzeigeinformationen zum Konfigurieren eines Bildschirms mit mehreren Bildschirmelementen | [2006/49] | English: | Transmission and reception of display information that configures a screen with multiple screen elements | [2006/49] | French: | Transmission et réception de l'information d'affichage configurant un écran avec des éléments d'écran multiples | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 28.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6105042 (AGANOVIC ZIJAD F [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * figures 2,4-7 *; | [X]EP1441308 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-14* paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1 * | Examination | US2005050172 |