EP1693983 - Authentication system and method using individualized and non-individualized certificates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imai, Tatsuya 3-15-18 Kichijoujihigashicho Musashino-shi Tokyo / JP | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06011791.8 | 23.07.2004 | [2006/34] | Priority number, date | JP20030201638 | 25.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003201638 | JP20030201644 | 25.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003201644 | JP20040198624 | 05.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004198624 | JP20040198627 | 05.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004198627 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1693983 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1693983 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04L29/06 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04L63/0876 (EP,US);
H04L63/0442 (EP,US);
H04L63/166 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/18] |
Former [2006/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Authentifizierungs-System- und Verfahren unter Verwendung von individualisierten und nicht-individualisierten Zertifikaten | [2006/34] | English: | Authentication system and method using individualized and non-individualized certificates | [2006/34] | French: | Système et méthode d'authentification utilisant des certificats individualisés et non-individualisés. | [2006/34] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 11.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04254424.7 / EP1501239 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 10.12.2007 | [2008/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001034833 (YAGASAKI ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2002026581 (MATSUYAMA SHINAKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [A]US2002078346 (SANDHU RAVI [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] *; | [A]US2003051134 (GUPTA DEEPAK [IN]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] * |