EP1733846 - Extractor for a ball joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klann Spezial-Werkzeugbau GmbH Breslauer Strasse 41 78166 Donaueschingen / DE | [2006/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klann, Horst Terra Wohnpark 12 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Neymeyer, Franz Neymeyer & Partner GbR Haselweg 20 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Neymeyer, Franz Neymeyer & Partner GbR, Haselweg 20 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06011889.0 | 09.06.2006 | [2006/51] | Priority number, date | DE20052009669U | 17.06.2005 Original published format: DE 202005009669 U | [2006/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1733846 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1733846 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1733846 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B25B27/02 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
B25B27/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Title | German: | Kugelgelenk-Abdrücker | [2006/51] | English: | Extractor for a ball joint | [2006/51] | French: | Extracteur de rotule | [2006/51] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 30.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | DK | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | HU | 11.05.2011 | IE | 11.05.2011 | IT | 11.05.2011 | LT | 11.05.2011 | LV | 11.05.2011 | NL | 11.05.2011 | PL | 11.05.2011 | RO | 11.05.2011 | SE | 11.05.2011 | SI | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | TR | 11.05.2011 | AT | 09.06.2011 | LU | 09.06.2011 | BE | 30.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | FR | 11.07.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | GB | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | ES | 22.08.2011 | IS | 11.09.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
TR | 11.05.2011 | ||
AT | 09.06.2011 | ||
LU | 09.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 11.07.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GB | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
AT | 09.06.2011 | ||
LU | 09.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 11.07.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GB | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
AT | 09.06.2011 | ||
LU | 09.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 11.07.2011 | ||
GB | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
AT | 09.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 11.07.2011 | ||
GB | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
AT | 09.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 11.07.2011 | ||
GB | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 11.07.2011 | ||
GB | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 11.07.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
PT | 12.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR2134741 (FACOM) [DA] 1 * page 1, line 38 - page 3, line 29 ** figures 1-5 *; | [DA]DE4437046 (KLANN HORST [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 26 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE29806883U (JUSTUS SCHMIDT GMBH & CO KG NE [DE]) [A] 1,6,7 * page 5, paragraph 9 - page 7, paragraph 3 * * figure 1 * |