EP1743753 - Shaping paste, its use and method of production of ceramic bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Kulzer GmbH Grüner Weg 11 63450 Hanau / DE | [2007/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hühn, Robin Nordring 16 63517 Rodenbach / DE | 02 /
Koops, Ulrich, Dr. Nordhäuser Strasse 13 64380 Rossdorf / DE | 03 /
Weiss, Özlem, Dr. Seebachstrasse 25 65929 Frankfurt / DE | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Schutzrechte, Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 06012146.4 | 13.06.2006 | [2007/03] | Priority number, date | DE2005128721 | 20.06.2005 Original published format: DE 10528721 | [2007/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1743753 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/38, A61K6/00 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
A61K6/90 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/90, C08L71/02 (EP);
A61K6/90, C08L91/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/03] | Title | German: | Formgebungspaste, ihre Verwendung sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung eines keramischen Körpers | [2007/03] | English: | Shaping paste, its use and method of production of ceramic bodies | [2007/03] | French: | Pâte de modelage, l'utilisation et procédé pour la fabrication de corps céramiques | [2007/03] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 30.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1498622 (ZIRCONAL PROCESSES LTD) [A] 1-13 * example - * * claim - *; | [A]EP0351805 (KEMPTEN ELEKTROSCHMELZ GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * example - * * claim - *; | [A]WO03035809 (NISSHIN OILLIO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [A]WO2004110959 (3M ESPE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * claim - * | by applicant | EP0241384 | DE10332802 | DE10127144 | DE10339603 | DE10346775 |