EP1734288 - Differential gearing for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakajima, Shinichiro JTEKT Corporation 5-8 Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06012251.2 | 14.06.2006 | [2006/51] | Priority number, date | JP20050178579 | 17.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005178579 | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1734288 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1734288 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16H48/08 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
F16H48/08 (EP,US);
F16H2048/082 (EP,US);
F16H2048/085 (EP,US);
F16H2048/087 (EP,US);
F16H2048/382 (EP,US);
F16H2048/387 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2008/40] |
Former [2006/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Differentialgetriebe für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2006/51] | English: | Differential gearing for vehicle | [2006/51] | French: | Différentiel pour véhicule | [2006/51] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 24.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4543854 (ROTH JAN [SE]) [X] 1 * columns 1-2; figure 1 *; | [DA]JPH05178579 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [DA]JP2520728Y (()); | [X]DE19621102 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,5 *; | [X]GB2311103 (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [X] 1-3 * pages 8-10; figures 6,7 *; | [X]JPH11218211 (TOCHIGI FUJI SANGYO KK) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE10310215 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0041]; figures 1,3 * |