EP1696435 - Recording and reproducing apparatus and terminal apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Kissei c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Min-Jae, Han c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kaeriyama, Takuya c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Imai, Tsutomu c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Jinbo, Seiichi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06012435.1 | 04.02.1999 | [2006/35] | Priority number, date | JP19980027297 | 09.02.1998 Original published format: JP 2729798 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1696435 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1696435 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00, H04N7/173, G06F3/06, G11B27/10, G11B27/034 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G11B19/122 (KR);
G11B19/12 (EP,US);
G11B20/00007 (EP,KR,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B27/002 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
H04N21/218 (KR);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/213 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US);
G11B2220/61 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/35] | G11B20/00, H04N7/173, H04H1/02, G06F3/06, G11B27/00, G11B27/034 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/35] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabegerät und Endgerät | [2006/35] | English: | Recording and reproducing apparatus and terminal apparatus | [2006/35] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction et appareil terminal | [2006/35] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 15.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/18] | 26.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2015/18] | 12.12.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99300817.6 / EP0935248 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990300817) is 15.04.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH103778 ; | [XI]JPS58161189 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,2,8,9,12 * abstract * [I] 3-7,10,11; | [XI]JPS61283089 (TEAC CORP) [X] 1,2,8,9,12 * abstract * [I] 11; | [XI]EP0383529 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6,8-10,12 * the whole document * [I] 7,11; | [A]DE4433868 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,9,12 * page 3, lines 17-58 *; | [XI]JPH0917165 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,12 * abstract * [I] 5,7,11; | [A]WO9705616 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1,9,12* the whole document *; | [XI]JPH0970020 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-4,9,10,12 * abstract * [I] 5-8,11 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 5, & JP10003778 A 19980106 (ALPINE ELECTRON INC) [A] 1,9,12 * abstract * | Examination | US5481509 | DE19649194 | US6137642 | - FOSTER E J, "JVC XM-D1BK MINIDISC RECORDER", AUDIO, AUDIO. PHILADELPHIA, US, (19950301), vol. 79, no. 3, ISSN 0004-752X, pages 66 - 69, XP000750809 |